Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dolphin, Karl Rudeen, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Morgan, Cole T., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Cullers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reissue TRO Harassment Date: 1/10/22 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404 Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing and TRO Temporary Restraining Order Granted. Date: 11/1/2021 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404 Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Notice of Hearing |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: TRO |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: CHRO After Hearing **PENDING HEARING |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for orders to stop Harassment filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.