Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Whitfield, Denise, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Healthcare Centre Of Fresno, Rockport Healthcare Support Services, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
Category36 Unlimited - Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Plaintiff Denise Whitfield against Rockport Healthcare Support Services, LLC and Healthcare Centre of Fresno, along with unidentified defendants. The complaint alleges damages and demands a jury trial. The ...
Civil Complaint filed
Date: August 20, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: August 20, 2021Proof of Service
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 5-7 Days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
12-8-22 Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition - Compel Arbitration Filed 6/6/22 ~ Alden Parker Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
December 08, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Whitfield v. Rockport Healthcare Support Services, LLC Superior Court Case No. 21CECG02463 Hearing Date: December 8, 2022 (Dept. 502) Motion: by Defendants to Compel Arbitration Tentative Ruling: ... | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
12/1/22 Declaration ~ Hearing 12/8/22 Declaration Filed Jody Wheeler |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
12/1/22 Reply ~ Hearing 12/8/22 Reply filed Hearing 12/8/22 ~ Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
11/22/2022-Declaration of Denise Whitfield in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration-Hrg: 12/8/2022 Declaration Filed Declaration of Denise Whitfield in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
11/22/2022-Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration-Hrg: 12/8/2022 Opposition filed Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.