Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rios, Jennifer Gabriela, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Chavez, Elvira, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Cullers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail of Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Personal Service of Request for CHRO and Response |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing and TRO Temporary Restraining Order Granted. Date: 10/25/21 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404 Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Notice of Hearing |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for orders to stop Harassment filed | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: TRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.