Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Puga-Rabago, Sonya, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Concentra Health Services, Inc., Serrano-Monson, Lilia, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
Category36 Unlimited - Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Notice of Hearing of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Civil Complaint filed |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil case cover sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.