Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sterling National Bank, N.A., Sterling National Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Awesome Charters And Tours, Llc, Awesome Charters And Tours Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, Morales, Romiro, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTharpe, D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Negin, Stephanie |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
9-30-22 Stipulation For Entry of Default Judgment Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 501 on 10-4-22 Order for: Stipulation Entry of Judgment |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Negin, Stephanie |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
CMC Stmt 03 Case Management Statement Filed |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
4/11/22 - Errata to Complaint Notice Filed of Errata to Complaint |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Negin, Stephanie |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment from chambers |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
CMC Stmt 02 Case Management Statement Filed 4/20/22 Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.