Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ambriz, Jessica, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Cerda, Hector Armando, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Cullers, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCullers, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit List Filed | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed Old Attorney: Pro Per New Attorney: Michelle Pepper |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reissue TRO Harassment Date: 11/8/2021 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404 Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept 404 Order on Request |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Filed to Continue |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Request Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.