Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gutierrez, Antonio, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Criego, Franz, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Brickey, Gabriel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrickey, Gabriel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment & Certificate of Mailing |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
2021-06-24 - Continued Hearing Notice Notice Filed Notice of Continued Ex parte for 6/24/21 |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
2021-06-24 - Declaration re Notice Declaration Filed Benjamin Pavone Re Notice |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing Order to Direct Attorney to Turn Over Case Filed - Ben Pavone Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment & Certificate of Mailing |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing Order to Direct Attorney to turn over case filed ~ Benjamin Pavone Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
2021-06-22 - Proposed Order1 Order Received for Signature **order not signed; see hearing dated 6/24/21** Proposed Order |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
2021-06-22 - Dec. iso Ex Parte Relief1 Declaration Filed Benjamin Pavone |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
2021-06-22 - Application for Ex Parte Relief Ex parte Filed Ex Parte Application for order directing attorney to turm over case file |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.