Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Corona, Maudiauna, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Hyundai Motor America, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Gaab, Kimberly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaab, Kimberly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Corona v. Hyundai Motor America Superior Court Case No. 21CECG01732 Hearing Date: July 7, 2022 (Dept. 503) Motion: Defendant Hyundai Motor America’s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Te... | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Signed POS 16469890 Proof of Service |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
6.16.21 Corona, Maudiauna v. HMA - Complaint Civil Complaint filed |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Notice Filed Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed) |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
6.16.21 Corona, Maudiauna v. HMA - Summons Summons issued and filed |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
6.16.21 Corona, Maudiauna v. HMA - CCC Sheet Civil case cover sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.