Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wynn, Nicole Noel, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Rigness, Richard Bradley, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Cullers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing and TRO REDACTED ~ Temporary Restraining Order Granted. Date: 8/30/21 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404 Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for orders to stop Harassment filed REDACTED |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing and TRO CONFIDENTIAL ~ Temporary Restraining Order Granted. Date: 8/30/21 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404 Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: TRO |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Notice of Court Hearing |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granted ~ CONFIDENTIAL ~ Request to keep minor's information confidential Judge: Cullers, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.