Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Anguiano-Perez, Ana Areli, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Garnica, Diana, Garnica, Magdalena, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Reply filed
Date: February 08, 2022Proof of Service
Date: July 30, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) 3-3-2022 Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) and certificate of mailing |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Consolidate Amanda Hebesha (w/ case 21CECL04732) Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment from Chambers |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed 3/15/22 Case Management Statement |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
2/25/22 ADRS ADR Stipulation Mediation filed Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: TBD |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
2/25/2022-Case Management Statement Case Management Statement Filed |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
2/8/2022-Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate Reply filed Reply in Support of Plaintiff Ana Areli Anguiano-Perez's Motion to Consolidate Actions |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
2/2/22 Memo in Opp HRG 2/16/22 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Actions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.