Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mercado, Felipe, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Washington Unified School District, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHamilton, Jeffrey Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
Category15 Unlimited - Other Employment |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
This complaint alleges various causes of action against the defendant, Washington Unified School District (WUSD). The plaintiff, Felipe Mercado, claims disparate treatment based on race, color, national origin, and ancestry, as well as a hostile work...
Civil Complaint filed
Date: June 11, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: November 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Summons issued and filed
Date: June 11, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: June 11, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: June 11, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 05, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 05, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 11, 2022ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: January 10, 2022Reply filed
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition filed
Date: April 22, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: May 25, 2022Notice Filed
Date: May 09, 2022Decl of Good Faith Attempt Filed Automatic 30-day extension
Date: May 26, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 27, 2022Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: May 05, 2022Notice Filed
Date: May 09, 2022Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: June 14, 2022Amended Document Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 15, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 25, 2022Decl of Good Faith Attempt Filed Automatic 30-day extension
Date: February 14, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: February 23, 2023Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: January 25, 2023Reply filed
Date: January 18, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Case Management Statement Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 25, 2023Opposition filed
Date: January 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Whalen, Robert |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
02/23/23 - Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only), TR & CM Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) w/ Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - Re: Demurrer |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed 7/15/22 - Laura Wolfe Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
February 23, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Felipe Mercado v. Washington Unified School District Superior Court Case No. 21CECG01671 Hearing Date: February 23, 2023 (Dept. 503) Motions: Defendant Washington Unified School District’s demurre... | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
2-14-23 Declaration Filed Decl of Good Faith Attempt Filed Automatic 30-day extension Pursuant to CCP 430.41 |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
01/25/2023 Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) w/ CM, - re: Demurrer Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) w/ Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - re: Demurrer |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment from Chambers |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Whalen, Robert |
|
January 25, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Mercado v. Washington Unified School District Superior Court Case No. 21CECG01671 Hearing Date: January 25, 2023 (Dept. 503) – Cont. See below. Motion: Defendant Washington Unified School District... | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
69684CaseMana009ade8 Case Management Statement Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.