Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Aguirre, Viviana, Lopez, Hermalinda, Martinez, Belen, Martinez, Maria, Rodriguez, Jesus, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Pro Se, against Abina, Raymond, Pacific Grain & Foods Llc, Perkins, Lee, Ramirez, Raquel, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTharpe, D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
Category36 Unlimited - Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint alleges various violations and claims against the defendants. The plaintiffs, Juan Zavala, Belen Martinez, Blanca Torres, Hermalinda Lopez, Jesus Rodriguez, Maria Martinez, and Viviana Aguirre, are individuals who were employees of Pac...
Civil Complaint filed
Date: June 10, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 28, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: June 10, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified
Date: June 11, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: August 19, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 24, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Reply filed
Date: February 14, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: August 19, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Amended Document Filed
Date: July 21, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: June 10, 2021Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: February 23, 2022Reply filed
Date: February 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Proof of Service
Date: February 15, 2022Proof of Service
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: August 19, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: April 13, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 05, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: April 13, 2022Statement filed
Date: May 04, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: February 15, 2022Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Proof of Service
Date: April 13, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Motion filed
Date: February 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Negin, Stephanie |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney Filed 4/13/22 ~ Laura Wolfe (NO KCK) Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney Filed 2/15/22 ~ Kevin Little (NO KCK) Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney Filed 2/15/22 ~ Kevin Little Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
5-4-22 Defendant's Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion to be Relieved as Counsel-HRG 5/18/22 Statement filed Defendant's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to be Relieved as Counsel |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
4/13/22 Proposed Order HRG 5/18/22 Order Received for Signature **PENDING HEARING Motion to be Relieved as Counsel HRG 5/18/22 |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
4/13/22 Notice of Motion HRG 5/18/22 Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel HRG 5/18/22 |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
4/13/22 POS HRG 5/18/22 Proof of Service Motion to be Relieved as Counsel HRG 5/18/22 |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
4/13/22 Declaration HRG 5/18/22 Declaration Filed ISO Motion to be Relieved as Counsel HRG 5/18/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.