Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ngo, Kevin Duy, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case against Huynh, Phuc, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Cullers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reissue TRO Harassment Date: 12/5/22 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404 Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reissue TRO Harassment Date: 12/6/21 Time: 8:30 AM Dept: 404 Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
List filed Witness List |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
List filed Exhibit list with exhibits |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed Old Attorney: Pro Per New Attorney: Jeffrey T. Hammerschmidt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.