Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mosqueda, Anita, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against Clovis Community Medical Center, Fresno Community Hospital And Medical Center, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Skiles, Jon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSkiles, Jon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Civil Complaint filed
Date: March 22, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: March 22, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: March 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Anita Mosqueda v. Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center Superior Court Case No. 21CECG00839 Hearing Date: August 3, 2023 (Dept. 403) Motion: Defendant Fresno Community Hospital and Medical ... | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Whalen, Robert |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
3/23/2023 - Minute Order Attachment, TR and CM Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) with Clerk's Certificate of Mailing |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - Admissions Deemed Admitted Kat Todd - Filed 2/15/23 Judge: Skiles, Jon M |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - Compel Initial Kat Todd - Filed 2/15/23 Judge: Skiles, Jon M |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - Admissions Deemed Admitted Kat Todd Judge: Skiles, Jon M |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - Compel Initial Kat Todd Judge: Skiles, Jon M |
|
March 23, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Mosqueda v. Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center Superior Court Case No. 21CECG00839 Hearing Date: March 23, 2023 (Dept. 403) Motion: 1) by Defendant Fresno Community Hospital and Medical ... | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
3/16/23 Reply to Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Seek Order Reply filed REPLY TO NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEEK ORDER TO DEEM ADMITTED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
3/16/23 Reply to Non-Opposition Reply filed REPLY TO NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF ANITA MOSQUEDAS DISCOVERY RESPONSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.