Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ted'S Budz Llc, filed a(n) 02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate case against Fresno County District Attorney'S Office, Smittcamp, Lisa A, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Brickey, Gabriel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrickey, Gabriel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
Category02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice Filed
Date: March 24, 2021Civil Complaint filed
Date: March 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Signed POS 16053979 Proof of Service |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
CV-47 Notice of Assignment of Judge For All Purposes Notice Filed assignment of judge for all purposes. |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
2021-03-23 sum100 summons Summons issued and filed |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
2021-03-20 Writ and Complaint Teds Budz (2) Civil Complaint filed |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
2021-03-23 cm010 civil case cover sheet Civil case cover sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.