Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arredondo, Juanna, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Rasier-Ca, Llc, Rasier, Llc, Snapp, Larry, Uber Technologies, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Gaab, Kimberly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaab, Kimberly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Civil Complaint filed
Date: March 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Estimated 5-7 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 503 Order for: (Proposed) Protective Order |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Referral to ADR | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by Both Parties Estimated 5-7 days |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.