Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Basil M. Hantash, M.D., Phd, Mba, Central Valley Dermatology Medical Group, Inc., Central Valley Dermatology Medical Group, Inc., A California Professional Corporation, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Eddings Attorney Support Services, Inc., Eddings Attorney Support Services, Inc., A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Brickey, Gabriel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrickey, Gabriel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2021 |
Category25 Unlimited - Professional Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 5-10 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 403 Order for: Protective Order - Confidential and Highly Confidential Designation |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designations; Redlined Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential and Highly Confidential Designation |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of Rescheduled Trial and Trial Related Dates |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Requested by Party Estimated Time 5-10 days |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.