Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Canales, Stephanie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Gonzalez, Jose Vivanco, Ortega'S Meat Distribution, Inc., A California Corporation, represented by Waterman, John R., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Gaab, Kimberly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaab, Kimberly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
Category22 Unlimited - Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Civil Complaint filed
Date: March 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 5-10 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
8/30/22 Stip and Proposed Order Cont Trial Order Received for Signature FWD to 503 - Stipulation to Continue Trial and Related Dates; Proposed Order |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation ADR Stipulation Mediation filed Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James Dilling |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice Change of Handling Atty |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Referral to ADR | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by Both Parties Estimated Time 5-10 days |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.