Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Nutt, Henry, Nutt, Kevin, Nutt, Lola, Nutt, Tyrone, Nutt, Vashon, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Asfc, Llc, Aspen Skilled Healthcare, Inc., Irwin-Singh, D.O., Crystal, Saint Agnes Medical Center, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHamilton, Jeffrey Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 15, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: May 10, 2021Proof of Service
Date: May 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 7-10 Days Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
03/24/23 -Stipulation and Order filed Regarding Second Amended Complaint with Respect to Deft. Saint Stipulation and Order filed Regarding Second Amended Complaint with Respect to Deft. Saint Agnes Medical Center Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
3/23/23 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Second Amended Complaint Order Received for Signature FWD to 503 - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Second Amended Complaint |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application and Order to Extend Time file Order extending time to serve and file the pleading is GRANTED Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
3/8/23 Amended Ex Parte for Order Extending Time Order Received for Signature Order signed and issued. FWD clerk's office 03/09/23 for further processing FWD to 503 - AMENDED Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time to Serve Pleading; [Proposed] Order |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
3/8/23 Ex Parte and Proposed Order to Extend Time Order Received for Signature *Order Amended by Counsel* - Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Time to Serve Pleading; [Proposed] Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.