Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hamada, Robert M., filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Sanchez, Giulio A., against Custom Produce Sales, Inc., Farris, Marvin A, Melenbacker, Robert G, Swenson, Rodney O, Torosian, Ted, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTharpe, D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
Category07 Unlimited - Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Civil Complaint filed
Date: February 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hamada Joint Stipulation Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept 501 on 10-4-2021 Joint Stipulation regarding nominal defendant Custom Produce Sales, Inc. and Order |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment with tentative ruling and certificate of mailing |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demurrer (Filed 5/3/21) - (to complaint) Tim Logoluso Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Taken Under Submission or Advisement | |
September 21, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Hamada v. Melenbacker, et al. Superior Court Case No. 21CECG00497 Hearing Date: September 21, 2021 (Dept. 501) Motion: Defendants Robert G. Melenbacker (individually and as trustee of the Robert a... | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
HRNG 2021.9.21 Reply brief iso demurrer Reply filed Hearing 9/21/21 ~ Reply brief in support of defendants demurrer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.