Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ocwen Loan Servicing. Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Watson, Brendi A, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Brickey, Gabriel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrickey, Gabriel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
Category26 Unlimited - Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Received Signed order forwarded to clerks office 05/27/2021 Forward to: Dept 501 |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed for Entry of Judgment |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
CV-48 Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Notice Filed Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purpose (emailed) |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons issued and filed | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Civil Complaint filed |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil case cover sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.