Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cruz, Jesse, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Stratas Foods, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Culver Kapetan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCulver Kapetan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
Category15 Unlimited - Other Employment |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a class action seeking unpaid compensation for wages, meal and/or rest period violations, interest, liquidated damages, and other penalties. The representative plaintiff alleges violations of various statutes, including the Californ...
Proof of Service
Date: March 22, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: May 24, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Jesse Cruz v. Stratas Foods, LLC Superior Court Case No. 21CECG00450 Hearing Date: May 25, 2023 (Dept. 502) Motion: Plaintiff’s Motion for an Order: 1) Granting Final Approval of Class Action Sett... | |
April 19, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Jesse Cruz v. Stratas Foods, LLC Superior Court Case No. 21CECG00450 Hearing Date: April 19, 2023 (Dept. 502) Motion: Plaintiff’s Motion for an Order: 1) Granting Final Approval of Class Action Se... | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Prelim Approval Class Settlement Filed 7/13/22 - Cody Bolce (cont. from 8/24/22) Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
November 03, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Jesse Cruz v. Stratas Foods, LLC Superior Court Case No. 21CECG00450 Hearing Date: November 3, 2022 (Dept. 403) Motion: by Plaintiffs for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Tentative Ruling:... | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
8/24/22 Minute Order + CM Minute Order Attachment & CM |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Prelim Approval Class Settlement Filed 7/13/22 - Cody Bolce Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
7/13/22 Mtn Prelim App HRG 8/24/22 Notice of Motion Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
7/13/22 POS MPA HRG 8/24/22 Proof of Service |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
7/13/22 Bolce Dec re Mtn Prelim App HRG 8/24/22 Declaration Filed Declaration of Cody Bolce ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
7/13/22 Cruz Dec re Mtn Prelim App HRG 8/24/22 Declaration Filed Declaration of Jesse Cruz ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.