Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Guaranty Solutions Recovery Fund 1, Llc, Guaranty Solutions Recovery Fund 1, Llc, An Arizona Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Coast Xpress, Inc., Coast Xpress, Inc., A California Corporation, Gill, Amarjit, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Mark E. Cullers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark E. Cullers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
Category20 Unlimited - Enforcement Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 17, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: February 17, 2021Application Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Appellant's Notice Designating on Appeal Respondent Notice Designating Record - Appendix, RTX Appendix and Reporter's Transcripts |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
General Motion Fix Bond ~ Kyle Hampton (filed 5/18/21) Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediation Notice from 5th DCA - Appeal Reinstated DCA F082797 Pursuant to 5th DCA Local Rule 2 |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Order Granted Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay on Enforcement of the Order Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing Stay ~ Kyle Hampton Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: pending reveiw until hearing Order for: granting Amarjit Gill's ex parte application for temporary stay on enforcemenent |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Amarjit Gill's ex parte application for temporary stay on enforcement of the order. |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application Ex parte Filed Ex parte application for temporary stay on enforecement of the order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.