Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Newrez Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against County Of Fresno Department Of Child Support Services, Mirelez, John R., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Brickey, Gabriel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrickey, Gabriel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
Category26 Unlimited - Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Civil Complaint filed
Date: February 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Judgment Received Forwarded to RA on 6/17/2021 |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Court Judgment | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s) Without Prejudice Does:1-20 |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application Filed Application for Default Judgment |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Application For Default Judgment |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Judical Notice In Support of Application For Default Judgment Against Defendant |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Non-Military Status |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.