Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Beauchamp, Evalyn, filed a(n) 02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate case against Board Of Behavioral Sciences, Department Of Consumer Affairs, State Of California, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Fresno with Brickey, Gabriel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrickey, Gabriel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
Category02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Fresno |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Reply filed
Date: September 20, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: February 15, 2022Summons issued and filed
Date: February 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
2-17-22 Stipulation and Order For Dismissal Stipulation and Order filed Stipulation For Dismissal and Order Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Negin, Stephanie |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
2/15/22 Stipulation and Order for Dismissal Order Received for Signature FWD to 402 - Stipulation for Dismissal and [Proposed] Order |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee Answer Filed to Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate and Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Phillip L. Arthur Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply filed Respondent's Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to Demurrer |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Notice of Demurrer Opposition filed |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judical Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.