Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Saldana, Carmen, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Perez, Victor Manuel, against M704 Kroger West Food 4 Less, Ralphs Grocery Company Dba Foods Co., represented by Nielsen , Thomas Dale, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kathy Ciuffini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathy Ciuffini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryProfessional Negligence Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: D'Morias, Melissa |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Received | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited ($435) | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.