Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Summary Judgment case against Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc, represented by Singer , Matthew Jason, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
CategorySummary Judgment |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside Judgment
Judge: Ciuffini, Kathy |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Tentative decision issued | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Submission on Motion to Set Aside Summary | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Collect Fee First Appearance Unlimited Civil ($435) | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion - All ($60.00) | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Reporter Fee $30 | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of: | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment (Granted) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.