Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jordan Carina M., against Marola Sergit, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with John J. Kralik presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn J. Kralik Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 21, 2021Complaint
Date: May 21, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 21, 2021Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service) Filed by Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Sergit Marola (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Order to Show Cause) Filed by Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Sergit Marola (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Synchrony Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Sergit Marola (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Non-Service)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.