Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Berrocal Peter, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Shapero Sarah, against Le Pegasus Llc, Sjo Investments, represented by Enochs Jon, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Antelope Valley with Michael C. Kelley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael C. Kelley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseAntelope Valley |
Amended Complaint; Filed by: Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff); As to: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff); As to: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff); As to: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Reply Statement of Non-Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Updated -- Judgment - Amended: Filed By: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: May 24, 2022Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Reply - REPLY STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Sarah Shapero) Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining O...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order) Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Demurrer) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Preliminary Injunction) Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Application for Preliminary Injunction) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Related Case ((21AVCV00323)) Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Peter Berrocal) Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Related Cases) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Related Cases)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status as to the named defendant SJO ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: May 24, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment of Dism...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice (of Plaintiff's Failure to File Opposition to Demurrer) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Judgment (- Amended) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Reply (Statement of Non-Opposition to Demurrer) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) Filed by Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of SJO Investments)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining O...))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted (Set One, Admitted and Conclusively Established)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeffrey D. Poindexter in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Peter Berrocal)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition to Application for Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer; Filed by: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff); As to: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff); As to: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Demurrer; Filed by: Le Pegasus, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Reply in Support of Preliminary Injunction; Filed by: Peter Berrocal (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Sharon Fleck in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Answers, Without Objections, to Special Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Randy Newman in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Sarah Shapero)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling on Demurrer and Notice of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice (of Plaintiff's Failure to File Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case ((21AVCV00323))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Sarah Shapero in Support of Reply in Support of Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Answers, Without Objections, to Form Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Related Cases) of )
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeffrey D. Poindexter in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Related Cases))
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Application for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Judgment (- Amended)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Reply (to Defendant's November 12, 2021 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition and Request for Continuance)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Failure to File Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment of Dism...))
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Status as to the named defendant SJO ...) of )
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Order (on Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees of $26,625.00 and Costs of $1,767.03)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status as to the named defendant SJO ...))
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Sharon Fleck in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (and Attached Exhibits in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Reply (Statement of Non-Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Peter Berrocal)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Sarah Shapero)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Randy Newman in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Related Case ((21AVCV00323))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining O...))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Application for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Related Cases))
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeffrey D. Poindexter in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Sharon Fleck in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Related Cases) of 06/21/2021)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Sarah Shapero in Support of Reply in Support of Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Order (Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice (of Plaintiff's Failure to File Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling on Demurrer and Notice of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Answers, Without Objections, to Special Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Answers, Without Objections, to Form Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted (Set One, Admitted and Conclusively Established)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (and Attached Exhibits in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Reply (Statement of Non-Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Sharon Fleck in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment of Dism...))
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeffrey D. Poindexter in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities (in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Reply (to Defendant's November 12, 2021 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition and Request for Continuance)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Order (on Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees of $26,625.00 and Costs of $1,767.03)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Failure to File Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Judgment (- Amended)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.