Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ballesteros, Anna, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategoryProbate - Trust |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | COPIES BRYAN L PHIPPS (Attorney) on behalf of ANNA BALLESTEROS (PETITIONER) Receipt: 264363 Date: 04/23/2021 | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPIES BRYAN L PHIPPS (Attorney) on behalf of ANNA BALLESTEROS (PETITIONER) Receipt: 264363 Date: 04/23/2021 | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF: == BY FAX == NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE "PETITON TO APPOINT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE". BRYAN L PHIPPS (Attorney) on behalf of ANNA BALLESTEROS (PETITIONER) |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES A JONES-WILLIAMS: Event: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE Date: 04/02/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: GRANTED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE(S) OR CO-TRUSTEE(S) ORDER RE "PETITION TO APPOINT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE" BRYAN L PHIPPS (Attorney) on behalf of ANNA BALLESTEROS (PETITIONER) |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (PROBATE) 04/02/2021. BRYAN L PHIPPS (Attorney) on behalf of ANNA BALLESTEROS (PETITIONER) | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE(S) OR CO-TRUSTEE(S)-FIRST APPEARANCE **BY FAX** PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE(S) OR CO-TRUSTEE(S)-FIRST APPEARANCE BRYAN L PHIPPS (Attorney) on behalf of ANNA BALLESTEROS (PETITIONER) Receipt: 260554 Date: 01/26/2021 |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE Date: 04/02/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: GRANTED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE Date: 04/02/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.