Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Amoruso, Jennifer M filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryProbate - Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL WILL ADMITTED TO PROBATE AND FILED COPY WILL ADMITTED TO PROBATE AND FILED SEE ATTACHMENT 3(f)3 REGARDING ORIGINAL WILL |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | COPIES KATHLEEN C WILLCOX (Attorney) on behalf of ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT) Receipt: 269176 Date: 08/18/2021 | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPIES KATHLEEN C WILLCOX (Attorney) on behalf of ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT) Receipt: 269176 Date: 08/18/2021 | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PROBATE APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR. KATHLEEN C WILLCOX (Attorney) on behalf of ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT) | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION KATHLEEN C WILLCOX (Attorney) on behalf of ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT) | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING (PROBATE) NOTICE OF HEARING - DECENDENTS ESTATE OR TRUST KATHLEEN C WILLCOX (Attorney) on behalf of ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT) |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ***BY FAX*** DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE KATHLEEN C WILLCOX (APPLICANT); ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT); ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT); ; KATHLEEN C WILLCOX (Attorney) on behalf of ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT) |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION Date: 08/13/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: GRANTED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING (PROBATE) ***BY FAX*** NOTICE OF HEARING (PROBATE) KATHLEEN C WILLCOX (APPLICANT); ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT); ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT); ; KATHLEEN C WILLCOX (Attorney) on behalf of ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT) |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION ***BY FAX*** PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION (WITH POWERS OF GENERAL REPRESENTATIVE UNDER PROBATE CODE 8545) Receipt: 266499 Date: 06/14/2021 ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT); ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT); ; KATHLEEN C WILLCOX (Attorney) on behalf of ANGELA EISENPRESS (APPLICANT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.