Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ashworth, Philip, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ashworth, Lindsey, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryFamily - Dissolution |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE PETITIONERS PRELIMINARY IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of PHILIP ASHWORTH (PETITIONER) | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FRANCES HEADLEY (Attorney) on behalf of LINDSEY ASHWORTH (RESPONDENT) Receipt: 269842 Date: 09/10/2021 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON 08/23/2021. PARTY SERVED PHILIP ASHWORTH COPIES OF RESPONSE - MARRIAGE/DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP FL-120 FRANCES HEADLEY (Attorney) on behalf of LINDSEY ASHWORTH (RESPONDENT) | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES (FEE WAIVER) FRANCES HEADLEY (Attorney) on behalf of LINDSEY ASHWORTH (RESPONDENT) | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR PHILIP ASHWORH GOING FROM ATTORNEY BRIAN CHAVEZ-OCHOA TO IN PRO PER BRIAN R CHAVEZOCHOA (Attorney) on behalf of PHILIP ASHWORTH (PETITIONER) | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | FEE FOR DOCUMENT RECEIVED VIA FAX OR EMAIL (GC70631 CRC10.815) 1-25 PAGES BRIAN R CHAVEZOCHOA (Attorney) on behalf of PHILIP ASHWORTH (PETITIONER) Receipt: 268333 Date: 07/28/2021 | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE == ELECTRONICALLY FILED == PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE TO RESPONDENT ON 7-25-21 OF PETITION, SUMMONS, BLANK RESPONSE, COMPLETED AND BLANK DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHLD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT, NOTICE OF INCLUSION INTO FAMILY LAW MANAGEMENT PROGRAM AND CMC. BRIAN R CHAVEZOCHOA (Attorney) on behalf of PHILIP ASHWORTH (PETITIONER) |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILD Receipt: 267844 Date: 07/15/2021 | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | FEE FOR DOCUMENT RECEIVED VIA FAX OR EMAIL (GC70631 CRC10.815) 1-25 PAGES **UCCJEA** BRIAN R CHAVEZOCHOA (Attorney) on behalf of PHILIP ASHWORTH (PETITIONER) Receipt: 267844 Date: 07/15/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.