Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dokken, James D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dokken, Tabata L, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryFamily - Dissolution |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 8:30 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: FURTHER FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 02/01/2022 Time: 8:30 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT (FAMILY LAW) SIGNED BY RESPONDENT ON 6/2/2021 FOR PETITION, SUMMONS, BLANK RESPONSE. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of JAMES D DOKKEN (PETITIONER) | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE ON 5/21/21 OF PETITION, SUMMONS, BLANK RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of JAMES D DOKKEN (PETITIONER) | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW INTAKE FORM == RECEIVED & DESTROYED == | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGMENT PROGRAM AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT PROGRAM AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE Receipt: 263258 Date: 03/29/2021 | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 09/17/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: FTA
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FAMILY LAW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 09/17/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.