Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Franco Castillo, Ana Beatriz, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Duarte, Emmer, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Don R. Franchi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDon R. Franchi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mail returned undelivered Document: FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING Reason: INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer
Judge: Franchi, Don R. |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Order received | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Cover Letter re: Order After Hearing Pursuant to CRC 5.125 | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mail returned undelivered Document: DOCUMENT RETURNED PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE Reason: NO SUCH NUMBER |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Interpreter present Arleen Pineda- Spanish |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Lack of Prosecution | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Attorney Mark Watson |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Franchi, Don R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.