Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rogers, Larry Allen, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by In Pro Per, against Dymond, Joseph, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Harassment |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (CIVIL HARASSMENT) TO LARRY ROGERS ON 08/25/2021 IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of JOSEPH DYMOND (DEFENDANT) | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of JOSEPH DYMOND (DEFENDANT) | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK REJECTING CH-120 RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS AND PROOF OF SERVICE AS BOTH DOCUMENTS ARE MISSING CASE NUMBERS AND CH-120 IS MISSING COURT NAME. | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) TRO (HARASS) scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 11:00 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: CONTESTED HEARING ON OSC FOR TRO (HARASSMENT) Date: 08/30/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: CIVIL HARASSMENT PETITION GRANTED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) TRO (HARASS) Date: 08/20/2021 Time: 11:00 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: GRANTED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (CIVIL HARASSMENT) BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/10/2021. PARTY SERVED JOSEPH DYMOND COPIES OF CH-109 NOTICE OF COURT HEARING. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of LARRY ALLEN ROGERS (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS PETITION FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER NOT GRANTED | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.