Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Crocker, Benjamin D, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by In Pro Per, against Macias, Hadley, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Renee C. Day presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRenee C. Day Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Harassment |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL (SENT TO COURT OF APPEALS AS AN UNLIMINTED CASE LEVEL) |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | APPELLATE NOTICE OF DEFAULT, MAILED TO APPELLANT | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) TRO (HARASS) Date: 08/04/2021 Time: 1:30PM Judge: DAY, RENEE Location: DEPT 2 Result: CIVIL HARASSMENT TRO DISMISSED
Judge: DAY, RENEE |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON 170._________ ET SEQ: ORDER OF RECUSAL (C.C.P. 170.1) COMMISSIONER SEXTON. |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) TRO (HARASS) Date: 08/04/2021 Time: 11:00 am Judge: DAY, RENEE Location: DEPT 2 Result: CIVIL HARASSMENT TRO DISMISSED
Judge: DAY, RENEE |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL NOTICE OF APPEAL IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of BENJAMIN D CROCKER (PLAINTIFF) |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT HEARING ***ORDERS NOT ISSUED** | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ***ORDERS NOT GRANTED*** | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) TRO (HARASS) Date: 08/04/2021 Time: 11:00 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.