Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Eggers, Samantha, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by In Pro Per, against Doherty, Michael J, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Harassment |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | FEE FOR DOCUMENT RECEIVED VIA FAX OR EMAIL (GC70631 CRC10.815) 1-25 PAGES IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of MICHAEL J DOHERTY (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 267630 Date: 07/12/2021 | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE TO MICHAEL J DOHERTY ON 7/2/21 OF ATTACHMENTS, EXHIBITS, NOTICE OF COURT HEARING (CIVIL HARASSMENT), REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS, RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS NOT ISSUED. IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of SAMANTHA EGGERS (PLAINTIFF) | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SHORT CAUSE HRG) TRO (HARASS) Date: 07/12/2021 Time: 11:00 am Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER NOT GRANTED | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT HEARING | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS PETITION FOR INJUNCTION PROHIBITING CIVIL HARASSMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.