Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fritz, Jennifer Fox, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tiemann, Peter, against Cass, Cynthia, represented by Romeo, Leslie A, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 07/22/2021. PARTY SERVED CYNTHIA CASS COPIES OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT, NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION PROGRAM AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, MANDATORY COURT NOTICE | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT LESLIE A ROMEO (Attorney) on behalf of CYNTHIA CASS (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 269156 Date: 08/17/2021 |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ADVANCE JURY FEE (NONREFUNDABLE) - SB 1021-CCP 631(B)- DEFENDANT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL DEFENDANT LESLIE A ROMEO (Attorney) on behalf of CYNTHIA CASS (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 269156 Date: 08/17/2021 |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 01/12/2022 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, PERSONAL INJURY MOTOR VEHICLE Receipt: 267261 Date: 07/01/2021 | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.