Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nunn, Roger, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Lovretovich, Joseph M, against Tpusa Inc A Delaware Coporation, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2099 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM COURT'S CONTROL | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | COPIES Receipt: 264380 Date: 04/23/2021 | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF: == BY FAX == NOTICE TO THE CLERK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA AND TO PLAINTIFF OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO THE UNTIED STATES DISTRICT COURT. |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT **BY FAX**ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of TPUSA INC A DELAWARE COPORATION (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 264020 Date: 04/15/2021 |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS **BY FAX** PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - SUMMONS TO JESSICA BROWN OF COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT, NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DLAY REDUCTION PROGRAM AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) INFORMATION SHEET ON 03/19/2021. JOSEPH M LOVRETOVICH (Attorney) on behalf of ROGER NUNN (PLAINTIFF) |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 09/29/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: VACATED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT Receipt: 262793 Date: 03/18/2021 | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.