Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Toma And Associates Inc A California Corporation, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Swett, Thomas M, against Ra Home Investments Llc A California Limitd Liabil, Iswd Inc A Nevada Corporation, Kinne, John, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT, ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION. DISMISSAL ENTERED AS REQUESTED. THOMAS M SWETT (Attorney) on behalf of TOMA AND ASSOCIATES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PLAINTIFF) | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE - SUMMONS TO JOHN DOE, REFUSED NAME OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION ON 03/16/2021. THOMAS M SWETT (Attorney) on behalf of TOMA AND ASSOCIATES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PLAINTIFF) |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS ---BY FAX---PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION SERVED ON JOHN KINNE AGENT FOR SERVICE ON 03/11/2021 |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS ---BY FAX---PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION SERVE DON JOHN KINNE ON 03/11/2021 THOMAS M SWETT (Attorney) on behalf of TOMA AND ASSOCIATES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PLAINTIFF) |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT == BY FAX == COMPLAINT FOR FRAUDULENT TRANSFER; CREDITOR'S SUIT; & AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT. Receipt: 262447 Date: 03/11/2021 THOMAS M SWETT (Attorney) on behalf of TOMA AND ASSOCIATES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (PLAINTIFF) |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 09/29/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: VACATED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 09/29/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.