Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Friends Of Greater Ione A Mutual Association, Foothill Conservancy A Non Profit Corporation Frie, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Graf, Michael W, against Edwin Lanks Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Compa, County Of Amador, represented by Johnson, Bradley B, Gillott, Gregory, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with Renee C. Day presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRenee C. Day Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2099 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PER 6-4-21 ORDER |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF PETITION. ENTERED AS REQUESTED MICHAEL W GRAF (Attorney) on behalf of FOOTHILL CONSERVANCY A NON PROFIT CORPORATION FRIE (PLAINTIFF) | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT UNLIMTED CASE, NO HEARING SCHEDULED IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of EDWIN LANKS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPA (DEFENDANT) BRADLEY B JOHNSON (Attorney) on behalf of EDWIN LANKS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPA (DEFENDANT) | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER (CIVIL) STIPULATION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING VACATION OF ZONE CHANGE AND ORDER THEREON. GREGORY GILLOTT (Attorney) on behalf of COUNTY OF AMADOR (DEFENDANT) |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO COUNTY COUNSEL REJECTING A STIPULATION FOR INCORRECT CASE NUMBER | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS REVIEW HEARING scheduled for 05/17/2021 at 8:30 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS REVIEW HEARING Date: 06/21/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 1 Result: VACATED
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES A TROTTER: SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF AMADOR DATE: MAY 17, 2021 CASE NO. 21CV12012 JUDGE: RENEE C. DAY REPORTER: -------- CLERK: A. CARTER BAILIFF: E. LARSON NEXT HRG: 06/21/2021 FOOTHILL CONSERVANCY, ET AL. MICHAEL GRAF VS COUNTY OF AMADOR GLENN SPITZER EDWIN LANDS, LLC. INTERESTED PARTY STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING 8:43 A.M. Matter called. Michael Graf is present on behalf of Plaintiffs, Foothill Conservancy, Et. Al. Deputy County Counsel Glenn Spitzer is present on behalf of the County of Amador. Mr. Graf represents to the Court that the parties have met and conferred, a resolution may be pending. Mr. Spitzer requests a continuance of this matter, a possible Stipulation and Order may be entered into at the next hearing. Matter is continued to June 21, 2021 at 8:30 in Dept 1 for a Review Hearing. Judge: JUDGE: RENEE C. DAY REPORTER: -------- CLERK: A. CARTER BAILIFF |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: CIVIL MISCELLANEOUS REVIEW HEARING Date: 05/17/2021 Time: 8:30 am Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. Location: DEPT 1
Judge: HERMANSON, J.S. |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF: NOTICE OF REQUEST AND REQUEST FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO PUBLIC RESOURCES CODE 21167.4 MICHAEL W GRAF (Attorney) on behalf of FOOTHILL CONSERVANCY A NON PROFIT CORPORATION FRIE (PLAINTIFF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.