Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Etter, Mark A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Greenblatt, Hank G, against Smith, Troula, Smith, Nikii D, represented by Oconnor, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDCIE ENTIRE ACITON OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION. ENTERED AS REQUESTED. HANK G GREENBLATT (Attorney) on behalf of MARK A ETTER (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES A JONES-WILLIAMS: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 08/11/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: HEARING OCCURRED-NO ORDERS - Matter is continued to November 10, 2021 at 1:30pm in dept 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for 08/11/2021 at 1:30 pm has been rescheduled as follows: Event: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 11/10/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: VACATED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: The following event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE scheduled for 08/11/2021 at 1:30 pm has been rescheduled as follows: Event: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 11/10/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT---ELECTRONICALLY FILED BRIAN OCONNOR (Attorney) on behalf of NIKII D SMITH, TROULA SMITH (DEFENDANT) | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | FEE FOR DOCUMENT RECEIVED VIA FAX OR EMAIL (GC70631 CRC10.815) 1-25 PAGES BRIAN OCONNOR (Attorney) on behalf of NIKII D SMITH, TROULA SMITH (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 268051 Date: 07/21/2021 | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | FEE FOR DOCUMENT RECEIVED VIA FAX OR EMAIL (GC70631 CRC10.815) 1-25 PAGES HANK G GREENBLATT (Attorney) on behalf of MARK A ETTER (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 267725 Date: 07/13/2021 | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT HANK G GREENBLATT (Attorney) on behalf of MARK A ETTER (PLAINTIFF) | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ADVANCE JURY FEE (NONREFUNDABLE) - SB 1021-CCP 631(B)- DEFENDANT BRIAN OCONNOR (Attorney) on behalf of NIKII D SMITH, TROULA SMITH (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 261217 Date: 02/11/2021 | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | FEE FOR DOCUMENT RECEIVED VIA FAX OR EMAIL (GC70631 CRC10.815) 1-25 PAGES BRIAN OCONNOR (Attorney) on behalf of NIKII D SMITH, TROULA SMITH (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 261217 Date: 02/11/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.