Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Debt Management Partneres, Llc, Debt Management Partneres, Llc, A Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian, John P, against Does 1 To 5, Inclusive, Workman, Fawn, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Chou, Danny Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChou, Danny Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: August 09, 2021Complaint
Date: August 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 7/21/2022Amount: $4399. Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 7/21/2022 Amount: $4399.32 |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 07/21/2022 Amount: 4,399.32 |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: 82.90 Credit: 0.00 Interest: 60.06 |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued Amount:$4,216.36 |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment by Court COPY MAILED TO LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP(ENVELOPE INCLUDED ON T Default Judgment by Court COPY MAILED TO LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP(ENVELOPE INCLUDED ON THE PACKET) ON 5/20/22 BY ANGELA SANTIAGO |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request For Court Judgment Request For Court Judgment |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 1788 Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 1788 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.