Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sofi Lending Corp. As Servicer And Attorney In Fact For Regions Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Haney, Rachel W., against Patel, Pravinkumar, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: September 01, 20215 CMS
Date: May 18, 2022Complaint
Date: September 01, 20211352758
Date: August 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | ||
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 5 CMS | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.