Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chernykova, Oleksandra, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Basola, Jennifer, against Mercedes-Benz Usa, Llc, Mercedes-Benz Usa, Llx, represented by Tahsildoost, Soheyl, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Swope, V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSwope, V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: October 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel ARBITRATION Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 4/14/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 4/14/2022 at 9:00 a.m. |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CMC - Not at issue - other/motion pending. | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION Declaration in Support OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.