Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Floyd Johnson, As A Representative And Aggrieved Employer Pursuant To The Private Attorneys General Act, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Dion-Kindem, Peter R, against Does 1 Through 10, Field Nation, Llc, Gerke, Darren, Hardel, Carl, Khan, Mynul, (total of 6) See All represented by Weissman, William Hays, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoiles, Robert D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
Category(15) Unlimited Other Employment |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Plaintiff Floyd Johnson against Field Nation, LLC and other defendants. The complaint alleges violations of the Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA) and misclassification of employees as independent contrac...
2024_04_15_Johnson_Notic_ry_of_Judgment_Clean
Date: April 15, 20242024_04_10_Johnson_Stip_ation_Award_with_Exh
Date: April 10, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: August 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024_04_15_Johnson_Notic_ry_of_Judgment_Clean | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024_04_10_Johnson_Stip_ation_Award_with_Exh | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023_08_23_Johnson_Super_of_Change_of_Address | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF FLOYD JOHNSON'S INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS AND DISMISS ALL NON-INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS BY DEFENDANTS FIELD NATION, LLC AND MYNUL KHAN
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 65651DECLA01a16f | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 65651DEFEN00ed8b | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 65651Proof02d320 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing re MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF FLOYD JOHNSON'S INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIM Notice of Hearing re MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF FLOYD JOHNSON'S INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS AND DISMISS ALL NON-INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS BY DEFENDANTS FIELD NATION, LLC AND MYNUL KHAN on 12/02/22 at 9:00 am |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 10/21/2022 Motion to Compel ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF FLOYD JOHNSON'S INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS AND DISMISS ALL NON-INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.