Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chopra, Monika, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Azizollahi, F. Shawn, against Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Natera, Inc, A Delaware Corporation, represented by Khanna, Swaja, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
Category(36) Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint alleges various claims against the defendants, including race discrimination, gender discrimination, disability discrimination, failure to prevent discrimination, failure to accommodate, retaliation, wrongful termination, intentional i...
Complaint
Date: August 12, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: August 12, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 15, 2021Order
Date: November 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 24, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 29, 2021239758.724374.Declaration of Gary S Brotman Re Stipulation and Order to ADR-2
Date: January 12, 2022SF76404.3424871.2022.01.14 - - Stipulated Protective Order MLG (22.1.13)
Date: January 14, 2022SF78932.3485199.Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Deadline to Attend Mediation
Date: February 02, 2022SF78946.3485677.Notice of Entry of Order or Judgment
Date: February 03, 202252988Notic002ade
Date: February 04, 202253038Stipu0043c3
Date: February 04, 2022stmnt of Nonagreement
Date: May 05, 2022Stipulation
Date: November 12, 2021First Amended Complaint
Date: November 19, 2021DECLA
Date: September 09, 2022ORDER
Date: September 09, 2022MOTION
Date: September 09, 2022mtn
Date: September 14, 2022sep stmt
Date: September 14, 2022decl
Date: September 14, 2022Notice and MTC
Date: September 23, 2022Decl Of Gary S. Brotman
Date: September 23, 2022Proposed Order
Date: September 23, 2022MTC to Compel Chapman
Date: September 27, 2022decl
Date: September 27, 2022prop order
Date: September 27, 202264834DEFEN0085b0
Date: October 13, 202264834Decla018067
Date: October 13, 2022ntc errata
Date: October 20, 2022sf115831-ss
Date: October 20, 2022sf115831-decl
Date: October 20, 2022sf115831-opp
Date: October 20, 2022prop order
Date: October 21, 2022Declaration of Mike Forcht
Date: October 21, 2022resp to sep stmt
Date: October 26, 2022reply to mtn
Date: October 26, 2022prop order
Date: October 26, 2022supp decl
Date: October 26, 2022SF116847-opp
Date: October 26, 2022SF116847-decl
Date: October 26, 2022ORDER
Date: October 28, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: August 12, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 12, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: November 29, 2021ADR Referral
Date: November 30, 2021Stipulation & Order
Date: January 20, 2022CMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip
Date: February 02, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Statement
Date: May 26, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: February 03, 2022Statement of Non-Agreement
Date: May 04, 2022Answer
Date: December 27, 2021Stipulation & Order
Date: February 03, 2022Notice of Entry of Order
Date: February 02, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: February 03, 202210 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: December 28, 2021Declaration
Date: January 12, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: September 14, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: September 09, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: September 09, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: September 14, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: August 15, 2022Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: June 07, 2022346465.1170525.Reply to Oppo to Motion to Compel Depo 11-1-22
Date: November 01, 2022346465.1170526.Supp Decl. of Gary Brotman ISO Plaintiff's MTC Deposition of Chapman
Date: November 01, 2022Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 04, 2022Declaration of Harold Jones
Date: November 04, 2022MP&A ISO of Motion
Date: November 04, 2022Notice and MTC to Compel Chapman
Date: November 10, 2022pos Chopra Motion to Compel Chapman Nov
Date: November 10, 2022Brotman Decl. ISO Plaintiff's MTC Chapman
Date: November 10, 2022Proposed Order
Date: November 10, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 12, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 19, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 12, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: June 07, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 07, 2022ORDER
Date: November 15, 2022NTC
Date: November 18, 2022SF129495-RFD
Date: January 26, 2023REQ
Date: February 02, 2023Order
Date: June 07, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Statement
Date: May 31, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: May 10, 2022Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: September 09, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: September 27, 2022Separate Statement
Date: September 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | REQ | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | SF129495-RFD | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NTC | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
November 13, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: HONORABLE NANCY L. FINEMAN, Department 04 MONIKA CHOPRA VS. NATERA, INC, ET AL. MONIKA CHOPRA F. SHAWN AZIZOLLAHI NATERA, INC HAROLD R. JONES PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE AND TESTIMO...
Judge: HONORABLE NANCY L. FINEMAN |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice and MTC to Compel Chapman | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | pos Chopra Motion to Compel Chapman Nov | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Brotman Decl. ISO Plaintiff's MTC Chapman | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.