Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Edwin Manolo Orellana Carbajal, Individually And As Successor In Interest To Obed Misael Orellana Priessing, Sonia Emilia Priessing Mendez, Individually And As Successor In Interest To Obed Misael Orellana Priessing, Musgrave, Jeffrey J., Renaissance Specialty Foods, Inc., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Beecher, Brian Gordon, against Advance Tuner Warehouse Inc., Bumanlag, Edgar, Does 1 To 100, Musgrave, Jeffrey J., Nrg Innovations, (total of 6) See All represented by Cholakian, Kevin K., Schirm, Barry R, Segal, Philip A., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWeiner, Marie S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: August 09, 2021256012.823814.256012.Ntc of Continued CMC - 6.13.2022
Date: March 10, 2022236894B.POSS010.197B7DE87CB
Date: April 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | SF34011896 | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | 282452.965315. Pltf CMS (08.30.22) | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 268819A2.POSS010.3D08CD64.569C | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-05-31 - Advance's CMC Statement | |
May 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Mendez_06.13.22signed | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | 58280CaseM005b77 | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | 269281.893686.269281.893636.CMS 6.15.22 | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | 269286.893691.269286.893641.CMS 6.15.22 | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | 57328CROSS00236a | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-04-27 - Advance Tuner's Answer to XC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.