Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Doe, Jane, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Liu, Zheng, Mazzola, Robert, against Does 1 - 10, Inclusive, Flores, Luis, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Chou, Danny Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChou, Danny Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: August 09, 2021Complaint
Date: August 09, 2021civ110 (1) - mazzola
Date: February 16, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 09, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: August 09, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: August 09, 2021Fee Waiver Denied
Date: August 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | civ110 (1) - mazzola | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Case Management Conferences, - |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
CMC - Not at issue - other/motion pending. Default against Defendant entered as requested on 9/21/2021 |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 2/9/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 2/9/2022 at 9:00 a.m. |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
September 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Denied Signed by JUDGE SCOTT on 08/10/2021 Fee Waiver Denied Signed by JUDGE SCOTT on 08/10/2021 |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer DEPARTMENT Judge: Scott, Joseph C. |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.