Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Annette Charles, Individually, And On Behalf Of Other Members Of The General Public Similarly Situated, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited Class Action case represented by Aiwazian, Edwin, against Aspiranet, A California Corporation, Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, represented by Dixon, R. Brian, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited Class Action |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: August 04, 2021Complaint
Date: August 04, 2021POS
Date: February 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 67282Notic0066a9 | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Type: REQUEST FOR DISMISSALSigned by: JUDGE FINEMANDate Signed: 9/27/2022 Order Type: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL Signed by: JUDGE FINEMAN Date Signed: 9/27/2022 |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | 64021Reque004623 | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | 64021Decla01b3b9 | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | 64021Propo029b39 | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | 64021Proof037236 | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL Declaration in Support OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; DECLARATION OF TRAVIS J. MAHER IN SUPPORT OF Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; DECLARATION OF TRAVIS J. MAHER IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL;ETC... |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying PROPOSED ORDER WITHOUT PREJUDICE Order Denying PROPOSED ORDER WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.